EP3902100 - RESONANT POWER TRANSFER SYSTEMS HAVING EFFICIENCY OPTIMIZATION BASED ON RECEIVER IMPEDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TC1 LLC One St. Jude Medical Drive St. Paul, MN 55117 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERSEN, Ethan F. 659 Aileen Street Oakland, CA 94609 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 21177168.8 | 06.10.2016 | [2021/43] | Priority number, date | US201562238586P | 07.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562238586 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3902100 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/12 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
A61M60/178 (EP,US);
A61M60/873 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8243 (EP,US);
H02J2310/23 (EP);
H02J50/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] |
Former [2021/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RESONANTE LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEME MIT EFFIZIENZOPTIMIERUNG BASIEREND AUF EMPFÄNGERIMPEDANZ | [2021/43] | English: | RESONANT POWER TRANSFER SYSTEMS HAVING EFFICIENCY OPTIMIZATION BASED ON RECEIVER IMPEDANCE | [2021/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE PAR RÉSONANCE À OPTIMISATION DU RENDEMENT BASÉE SUR L'IMPÉDANCE DU RÉCEPTEUR | [2021/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16854282.7 / EP3360233 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2014028110 (PETERSEN ETHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0129]; figures 1-17 * [A] 8; | [A]US2014092649 (HSU JR-UEI [TW]) [A] 1-15; | [X]US2014266035 (CERN YEHUDA [IL]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0078]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US2015249345 (KASHIWAGI YUKI [JP], et al)[A] 1-15; | [E]US2018294674 (CHOI WOOJIN [KR], et al) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0112]; figures 1-13 *; | [X] - OLVITZ L ET AL, "Wireless power transfer for mobile phone charging device", MIPRO, 2012 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 35TH INTERNATIONAL CONVENTION, IEEE, (20120521), ISBN 978-1-4673-2577-6, pages 141 - 145, XP032201897 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * | [PA] - TRAN DUC-HUNG ET AL, "Design and implementation of high efficiency Wireless Power Transfer system for on-board charger of Electric Vehicle", 2016 IEEE 8TH INTERNATIONAL POWER ELECTRONICS AND MOTION CONTROL CONFERENCE (IPEMC-ECCE ASIA), IEEE, (20160522), doi:10.1109/IPEMC.2016.7512685, pages 2466 - 2469, XP032924672 [PA] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPEMC.2016.7512685 | by applicant | US5350413 | WO0074747 | WO0137926 | US6553263 | US6591139 | US2003171792 | WO2007053881 | US2008027293 | WO2008066941 | WO2009018271 | US7571007 | US7650187 | WO2010030378 | US2010102639 | US7711433 | US7741734 | US7774069 | WO2010089354 | US7825543 | US2010308939 | US7865245 | US8140168 | WO2012045050 | WO2012056365 | WO2012087807 | WO2012087811 | WO2012087816 | WO2012087819 | US8562508 | US2014005466 | US2015222139 |