EP3928827 - ANTENNA ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curonix LLC 1310 Park Central Blvd. South Pompano Beach, FL 33064 / US | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states Stimwave Technologies Incorporated 1310 Park Central Blvd. South Pompano Beach, FL 33064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRESEN, Chad Pompano Beach, 33064 / US | 02 /
LEBARON, Richard Miami Beach, 33140 / US | 03 /
PERRYMAN, Laura Tyler Scottsdale, 85255 / US | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21177219.9 | 31.12.2015 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | US201462098946P | 31.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462098946 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928827 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/372, A61N1/378, H01Q1/27 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61N1/36125 (EP,US);
A61N1/3605 (EP,US);
A61N1/37229 (EP,US);
A61N1/3787 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG | [2021/52] | English: | ANTENNA ASSEMBLY | [2021/52] | French: | ENSEMBLE ANTENNE | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 29.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15876382.1 / EP3242714 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2013088304 (HENDERSON ROBERT IAN [GB], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0027] - [0056]; figures 1, 2, 10 * [Y] 11-15 [I] 2-10; | [YA]US2013310901 (PERRYMAN LAURA TYLER [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-10; | [YA]US2014275847 (PERRYMAN LAURA TYLER [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-10; | [YA]WO2014153219 (PERRYMAN LAURA TYLER [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-10; | [YA]WO2014153223 (PERRYMAN LAURA TYLER [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-10; | [YA]WO2014153228 (PERRYMAN LAURA TYLER [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * the whole document *[A] 1-10; | [YA]US2014336727 (PERRYMAN LAURA TYLER [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-10 | by applicant | WO2012US23029 | WO2012US32200 | WO2012US48903 | WO2012US50633 | WO2012US55746 |