EP3928770 - A MAZINDOL IR/SR MULTILAYER TABLET AND ITS USE FOR THE TREATMENT OF ATTENTION DEFICIT/HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NLS Pharmaceutics AG Alter Postplatz 2 6370 Stans / CH | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZWYER, Alexander, C. 9053 TEUFEN / CH | 02 /
AMSEL, Lewis, P. SARASOTA, 34241 / US | 03 /
SCHMITH, Virginia WRIGHTSVILLE BEACH, 28480 / US | 04 /
BRANTLEY, Scott APEX, 27539 / US | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21177251.2 | 08.03.2017 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | US201662305600P | 09.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662305600 P | WO2016EP55048 | 09.03.2016 Original published format: PCT/EP2016/055048 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928770 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/24, A61K31/4184 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/2086 (EP,IL);
A61K31/4188 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/209 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K33/26 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61K8/368 (EP);
A61K8/675 (EP);
A61K9/0053 (IL,US);
A61K9/2095 (IL,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/18 (EP,IL,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4188, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/26, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Validation states | MA | 01.06.2021 | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAZINDOL-IR/SR-MEHRSCHICHTTABLETTE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUFMERKSAMKEITSDEFIZIT/HYPERAKTIVITÄTSSTÖRUNG (ADHD) | [2021/52] | English: | A MAZINDOL IR/SR MULTILAYER TABLET AND ITS USE FOR THE TREATMENT OF ATTENTION DEFICIT/HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) | [2021/52] | French: | COMPRIMÉ MULTICOUCHE DE MAZINDOL À LIBÉRATION IMMÉDIATE/LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU TROUBLE DÉFICITAIRE DE L'ATTENTION AVEC HYPERACTIVITÉ (TDAH) | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17724102.3 / EP3426232 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007264323 (SHOJAEI AMIR [US], et al); | [A]US2009318520 (KOVACS BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]WO2011123496 (SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0123496 | US8293779 | WO2016EP55048 |