EP3893046 - BACKLIGHT UNIT AND DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GO, Wangseop 137-724 Seoul / KR | 02 /
SEO, Sangho 137-724 Seoul / KR | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21177347.8 | 12.10.2010 | [2021/41] | Priority number, date | US200926054009P | 12.11.2009 Original published format: US 26054009 P | KR20090108953 | 12.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090108953 | US20100301358P | 04.02.2010 Original published format: US 301358 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893046 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3893046 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G02F1/13357, G02B6/00, F21V8/00 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
G02B6/0088 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
G02F1/133308 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/00 (CN);
G02B6/009 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133603 (CN);
G02F1/133615 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133314 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133607 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | RÜCKLICHTEINHEIT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2021/41] | English: | BACKLIGHT UNIT AND DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME | [2021/41] | French: | UNITÉ DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE LA COMPRENANT | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 17.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10830111.0 / EP2499537 | EP14003271.5 / EP2821842 | EP16170013.3 / EP3101467 | EP18156894.0 / EP3339947 | EP20154989.6 / EP3667405 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | LU | 12.10.2023 | [2024/30] |
Former [2024/28] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5727862 (WU WEN-CHING [TW]) [Y] 1,3-14 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 48 *[A] 2; | [A]US2008088763 (TORIYAMA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]US2008232134 (WENG DERCHIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] *; | [YA]US2009256987 (JEON WOOK [KR], et al) [Y] 1,3-14 * figures 6-9 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] * [A] 2; | [E]EP2251721 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-14 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0046] * |