EP3913269 - HOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terada, Junpei Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
Ota, Daisuke Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | 03 /
Kitaichi, Masanori Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | 04 /
Ueta, Yutaka Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | 05 /
Morita, Shigeru Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | 06 /
Kawasaki, Kazuyoshi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | 07 /
Morikawa, Tatsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | 08 /
Kawai, Satoshi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | 09 /
Fukuoka, Shoji Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-8585 / JP | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21177353.6 | 25.08.2011 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | US201037703610P | 25.08.2010 Original published format: US 37703610 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913269 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/04, C08K3/04, C08L27/18 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
F16L11/06 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
B32B2250/00 (US);
C08K2201/006 (EP);
Y10T428/1352 (US);
Y10T428/1355 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L27/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | SCHLAUCH | [2021/47] | English: | HOSE | [2021/47] | French: | TUYAU | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11817201.4 / EP2587107 | EP18181435.1 / EP3444514 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6161592 (YAMAMOTO YASUO [JP], et al); | [X]US2001000788 (ONO SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1217279 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP1816337 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPS6157641 | JPH09111081 | WO9823675 | JPH11147891 | WO0005959 | WO0009603 | JP2000193152 | JP2003083479 | JP2007269008 |