EP4098463 - A METHOD FOR ESTIMATING AN EFFECTIVE LENGTH OF A FIRST VEHICLE SEGMENT OF A VEHICLE COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Daniel 413 21 Göteborg / SE | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21177667.9 | 04.06.2021 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098463 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/24, G01B21/06, G01S17/88, B62D13/06 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
G01B11/02 (EP);
B60W40/12 (CN,US);
B60W30/045 (US);
B60D1/015 (EP);
B60D1/245 (EP);
B60D1/62 (EP);
B62D15/021 (CN);
B62D53/00 (CN);
G01B11/043 (US);
G01B11/26 (US);
G01D18/00 (CN);
G06T7/60 (EP);
B60W2300/145 (US);
B60W2420/403 (US);
B60W2520/22 (US);
B60W2530/201 (US);
B60W2540/18 (US);
B60W2720/22 (US);
B62D13/06 (EP);
G01S13/88 (EP);
G01S13/931 (EP);
G01S15/88 (EP);
G01S17/88 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER EFFEKTIVEN LÄNGE EINES ERSTEN FAHRZEUGSEGMENTS EINER FAHRZEUGKOMBINATION | [2022/49] | English: | A METHOD FOR ESTIMATING AN EFFECTIVE LENGTH OF A FIRST VEHICLE SEGMENT OF A VEHICLE COMBINATION | [2022/49] | French: | MÉTHODE D'ESTIMATION DE LA LONGUEUR EFFECTIVE D'UN PREMIER SEGMENT DE VÉHICULES D'UNE COMBINAISON DE VÉHICULES | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 02.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015291179 (TAGESSON KRISTOFFER [SE]) [Y] 9* paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0033]; figure -; claim - *; | [XYI]US2019086204 (CRITCHLEY JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10-15 * paragraphs [0048] , [ 0050] - [0052] - [ 0059] , [ 0073] - [0075] - [ 0081]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 9 [I] 6,8; | [Y]WO2020207572 (VOLVO TRUCK CORP [SE]) [Y] 9 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1; figure -; claim - * |