EP3922308 - ULTRASONIC GENERATOR WITH ADJUSTABLE ULTRASONIC FOCUSING DEPTH FOR TREATING OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeisys Medical Inc. 307-ho, Daerung Techno Tower 8-cha 96, Gamasan-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08501 / KR | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Eun Ho Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Kyun Tae Seoul / KR | 03 /
MOON, Kwang Hee Seoul / KR | 04 /
LEE, Su Yong Seoul / KR | 05 /
KIM, Min Young Seoul / KR | 06 /
YI, Won Ju Seoul / KR | 07 /
KANG, Dong Hwan Seoul / KR | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Kurig, Thomas Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2022/50] |
Former [2021/50] | Kurig, Thomas Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21177896.4 | 07.06.2021 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | KR20200071005 | 11.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200071005 | KR20210001881 | 07.01.2021 Original published format: KR 20210001881 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922308 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3922308 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/02, // A61N7/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
A61N7/02 (EP,CN,KR);
A61N7/00 (CN,US);
B06B1/00 (CN,US);
A61N2007/0008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N2007/0056 (CN,KR);
A61N2007/0065 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | A61N7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLGENERATOR MIT EINSTELLBARER ULTRASCHALLFOKUSSIERTIEFE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FETTLEIBIGKEIT | [2021/50] | English: | ULTRASONIC GENERATOR WITH ADJUSTABLE ULTRASONIC FOCUSING DEPTH FOR TREATING OBESITY | [2021/50] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR ULTRASONIQUE À PROFONDEUR DE FOCALISATION ULTRASONIQUE RÉGLABLE DE TRAITEMENT DE L'OBÉSITÉ | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22201785.7 / EP4140541 | EP23193456.3 / EP4257182 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | IE | 07.06.2023 | LU | 07.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
IE | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
LU | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR101487497B (ELIMTECH CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]KR20160063119 (ROBOMAX CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR101700334B (ITC CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170015269 (ATTIBE BEAUTY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2020100762 (BARTHE PETER G [US], et al) |