EP3902155 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR DETERMINING SUITABLE TRANSMIT DIRECTIONS FOR BEAMFORMED TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIGREN, Torbjörn SE-756 53 UPPSALA / SE | 02 /
MAURITZ, Oskar SE-121 39 JOHANNESHOV / SE | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 21178168.7 | 29.09.2015 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3902155 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04W16/10, H04W28/18, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W74/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/043 (US);
H04B7/0621 (US);
H04B7/0643 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/086 (US);
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04W36/0072 (EP,US);
H04W76/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] |
Former [2021/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER GEEIGNETEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSRICHTUNGEN FÜR STRAHLGEFORMTE ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2021/43] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR DETERMINING SUITABLE TRANSMIT DIRECTIONS FOR BEAMFORMED TRANSMISSION | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER DES DIRECTIONS D'ÉMISSION APPROPRIÉES POUR UNE ÉMISSION EN FORME DE FAISCEAU | [2021/43] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 27.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15779040.3 / EP3357174 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010265924 (YONG SU KHIONG [US], et al); | [X]US2013201938 (SEOL JI-YUN [KR], et al); | [X]WO2014116811 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al); | by applicant | US2013182666 |