EP3950515 - METHOD AND PACKAGING DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SHRINK PACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones Aktiengesellschaft Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREIS, Marcus 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
HAIDACHER, Peter 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 03 /
SPINDLER, Herbert 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 21178184.4 | 08.06.2021 | [2022/06] | Priority number, date | DE202010120820 | 06.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020120820 | [2022/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950515 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65B53/06, B65B57/08, B65B21/24, B65B65/00, B65B59/00, B65B59/02, B65B11/10, G05B13/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B65B53/063 (EP);
B65B11/10 (EP);
B65B21/245 (EP);
B65B57/08 (EP);
B65B59/003 (EP);
B65B59/02 (EP);
B65B65/006 (EP);
G05B19/41875 (EP);
B65B2220/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VERPACKUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON SCHRUMPFGEBINDEN | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD AND PACKAGING DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SHRINK PACKS | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'EMBALLAGE PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER DES EMBALLAGES RÉTRACTABLES | [2022/06] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 27.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP2778080 (ARPAC LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 14] , [0 23] , [0 31] - [0033] * [A] 6,12-14 [Y] 3,5,7,10; | [Y]EP2801533 (KRONES AG [DE]) [Y] 13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 62] , [0 66] *; | [XAY]EP3184444 (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11 * figures 1, 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 28] , [0 30] , [0 34] , [0 37] , [0 38] , [0 40] , [0 43] - [0045] - [0 53] - [0055] * [A] 6,12-14 [Y] 3,5,7,10; | [XY]DE102010032455 (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 12] , [0 29] - [0031] - [0 35] - [0036] - [0 45] , [0 48] , [0 49] * [Y] 3,5-7,10,12-14; | [Y]EP3659932 (KRONES AG [DE]) [Y] 6,7,12,13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0077] , [0 98] , [ 101] , [ 111] , [ 112] , [ 128] , [ 129] *; | [Y]US2020219741 (YUN TAE JU [KR], et al) [Y] 14 * figure 2 ** paragraphs [0049] - [0050] * | by applicant | DE102013103863 |