EP3925973 - VACCINE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR RESTORING NKG2D PATHWAY FUNCTION AGAINST CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRANOFF, Glenn Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 02 /
WUCHERPFENNING, Kai W. Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 03 /
HARVEY, Christopher Boston, MA 02131 / US | 04 /
HODI, F. Stephen Framingham, MA 02115 / US | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 21178565.4 | 16.03.2015 | [2021/51] | Priority number, date | US201461953064P | 14.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461953064 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925973 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/74, A61K39/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/70539 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5152 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/6037 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] |
Former [2021/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DER NKG2D-WEGFUNKTION GEGEN KREBS | [2021/51] | English: | VACCINE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR RESTORING NKG2D PATHWAY FUNCTION AGAINST CANCERS | [2021/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS VACCINALES ET MÉTHODES POUR RÉTABLIR LA FONCTION DE LA VOIE NKG2D CONTRE LES CANCERS | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 17.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15721054.3 / EP3116903 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011311561 (MARTIN JR DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US8182809 (WU JENNIFER D [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 36 * * column 5, line 9 - line 13 * * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 6 * * column 17, lines 47-51 - column 18, lines 65-66 * * page 24, line 7 - line 61 * * column 33, line 55 - column 34, line 22 *; | [T]WO2014144791 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [T] * abstract * * page 68, line 5 - page 70, line 16 *; | [T] - MIYAKO HIROHITO ET AL, "Antitumor Effect of New HER2 Peptide Vaccination Based on B Cell Epitope", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ANTICANCER RESEARCH, GR, (20110930), vol. 31, no. 10, ISSN 0250-7005, pages 3361 - 3368, XP009517809 [T] * abstract * * page 3361, column right, paragraph 1st full - page 3362, column left, paragraph 2nd full * | [T] - KAUMAYA PRAVIN T P, "A paradigm shift: Cancer therapy with peptide-based B-cell epitopes and peptide immunotherapeutics targeting multiple solid tumor types: Emerging concepts and validation of combination immunotherapy", HUMAN VACCINES & IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, US, (20150531), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.1080/21645515.2015.1026495, ISSN 2164-5515, pages 1368 - 1386, XP009517810 [T] * abstract * * page 1369, line 12 - line 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/21645515.2015.1026495 | by applicant | US2004067503 | US2009175821 | US7771718 | WO2011063336 | US7959916 | US8110196 | US2012100182 | US8182809 | WO2013049517 | US2013202707 | - WU et al., "Prevalent Expression of the Immunostimulatory MHC Class I Chain-related Molecule is Counteracted by Shedding in Prostate Cancer", J Clin Invest, (20040000), vol. 114, pages 560 - 8 | - GROH et al., "Tumour-derived Soluble MIC Ligands Impair Expression of NKG2D and T-cell Activation", Nature, (20020000), vol. 419, pages 734 - 8 | - DOUBROVINA et al., "Evasion from NK Cell Immunity by MHC Class I Chain-related Molecules Expressing Colon Adenocarcinoma", J Immunol, (20030000), vol. 171, pages 6891 - 9, XP002507236 | - MARTEN et al., "oluble MIC is Elevated in the Serum of Patients with Pancreatic Carcinoma Diminishing Gamma Delta T Cell Cytotoxicity", Int J Cancer, (20060000), vol. 119, pages 2359 - 65 | - W. R. TAYLOR, "The Classification of Amino Acid Conservation", J. Theor. Biol., (19860000), vol. 119, doi:10.1016/S0022-5193(86)80075-3, pages 205 - 218, XP055050432 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-5193(86)80075-3 | - D. BORDOP. ARGOS, "Suggestions for ''Safe'' Residue Substitutions in Site-Directed Mutagensis", J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 217, pages 721 - 729 | - "Rapid and Sensitive Sequence Comparison with FASTP and FASTA", W. A. PEARSON, Meth. Enzymology, Academic Press, (19900000), vol. 183, pages 63 - 98 | - M. S. JOHNSONJ. P. OVERINGTON, "A Structural Basis for Sequence Comparisons: An Evaluation of Scoring Methodologies", J. Mol. Biol., (19930000), vol. 233, doi:10.1006/jmbi.1993.1548, pages 716 - 738, XP024008842 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1993.1548 | - GUO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20040000), vol. 101, no. 25, pages 9205 - 9210 | - GONG et al., BMC: Bioinformatics, (20070000), vol. 6, pages 1471 - 2105 | - ANDRADEWEI et al., Pure and Appl. Chem., (19920000), vol. 64, no. 11, pages 1777 - 1781 | - CHOI et al., Proteins: Structure, Function, and Bioinformatics, (20090000), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 14 - 25 | - PARK et al., BMC: and Bioinformatics, (20090000), vol. 10, pages 1471 - 2105 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math, (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSONLIPMAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ZUKER, Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 48 - 52 | - JAEGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 7706 - 10 | - JAEGER et al., Methods Enzymol., (19890000), vol. 183, pages 281 - 306 | - Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (19990302), vol. 96, no. 5, pages 1915 - 20 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19980000), vol. 120, no. 39, pages 9979 - 9987 | - Science Translation Medicine, Sci Transl Med, (20090000), vol. 1, pages 8 - 19 | - KLINMAN, Expert Rev. Vaccines, (20030000), vol. 2, pages 305 - 15 | - PASHINE et al., Nature Med., (20050000), vol. 11, no. 4, pages S63 - S68 | - LIU et al., JCI, (20130000), vol. 123, no. 10, pages 4410 - 4422 | US19340617920 | US19980619131 |