EP3926983 - HEARING SYSTEM WITH AT LEAST ONE HEARING INSTRUMENT WORN IN OR ON THE EAR OF THE USER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A HEARING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMEZ, Gabriel 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 21179016.7 | 11.06.2021 | [2021/51] | Priority number, date | DE202010207585 | 18.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020207585 | [2021/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3926983 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3926983 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H04R1/40, H04R3/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04R25/407 (EP,CN,US);
H04R25/405 (EP,US);
H04R25/505 (EP,US);
H04R25/552 (EP);
H04R3/005 (EP);
H04R1/406 (EP);
H04R2225/021 (US);
H04R2225/41 (EP);
H04R2225/43 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2021/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖRSYSTEM MIT MINDESTENS EINEM AM KOPF DES NUTZERS GETRAGENEN HÖRINSTRUMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES SOLCHEN HÖRSYSTEMS | [2021/51] | English: | HEARING SYSTEM WITH AT LEAST ONE HEARING INSTRUMENT WORN IN OR ON THE EAR OF THE USER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A HEARING SYSTEM | [2021/51] | French: | SYSTÈME AUDITIF DOTÉ D'AU MOINS UN INSTRUMENT AUDITIF PORTÉ SUR LA TÊTE DE L'UTILISATEUR, AINSI QUE MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL SYSTÈME AUDITIF | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 02.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004016037 (UNIV NANYANG [SG], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 18, line 29 - page 26, line 26 * * figure 2 *; | [X]WO2005029914 (WIDEX AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12 * abstract * * pages 1-5 * * pages 11-14 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]WO2007106399 (MH ACOUSTICS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,12 * abstract * * page 6, line 17 - page 8, line 30 * * page 18, line 10 - page 22, line 3 * * figures 6,12-14 *; | [X]EP2439958 (OTICON AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,6-8,12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2611220 (STARKEY LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0037] ** figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP2941019 (OTICON AS [DK]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2908550 |