EP4104742 - AN ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ambu A/S Baltorpbakken 13 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSEN, Lasse Markworth 3460 Birkerød / DK | 02 /
SØRENSEN, Morten 2750 Ballerup / DK | 03 /
LUNDBECH, Michael René 4100 Ringsted / DK | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21179543.0 | 15.06.2021 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4104742 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/07, A61B1/06, // G02B23/24 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
A61B1/00101 (EP);
A61B1/00091 (EP);
A61B1/00096 (EP);
A61B1/0011 (EP);
A61B1/05 (EP);
A61B1/07 (EP);
G02B23/2476 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP | [2022/51] | English: | AN ENDOSCOPE | [2022/51] | French: | ENDOSCOPE | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 10.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005075538 (BANIK MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0113]; figures 6A-6I *; | [X]EP3539445 (AMBU AS [DK]) [X] 1,6-9* paragraph [0023]; figure 3; claims 1-11 *; | [X]EP3613326 (AMBU AS [DK]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0049] , [0079]; figure 3 *; | [X]EP3788940 (AMBU AS [DK]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0128]; figures 4a-4e * | by applicant | WO2014106511 | EP3539449 | EP3539451 |