EP3913126 - ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IM, Myunghun Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Hwanjin Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
YU, Seonhwa Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Sunggyun Seoul 08592 / KR | 05 /
WOO, Kyungchul Seoul 08592 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Jaehyun Seoul 08592 / KR | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21179573.7 | 30.08.2019 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | KR20180103077 | 30.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180103077 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913126 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3913126 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/32, // D06F34/18, D06F103/02, D06F103/46, D06F105/46, D06F105/48 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
D06F33/32 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/18 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/304 (KR);
G06N3/08 (KR,US);
D06F2103/02 (EP,US);
D06F2103/04 (KR);
D06F2103/06 (KR);
D06F2103/24 (KR);
D06F2103/46 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT KÜNSTLICHER INTELLIGENZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON | [2021/47] | English: | ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME | [2021/47] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LINGE ASSISTÉ PAR INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 07.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19194768.8 / EP3617365 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2473661 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [I]EP2719812 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]EP2837732 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR101841248B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]EP3301216 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | Examination | EP2473661 | by applicant | KR19990065538 | KR20060061319 |