EP3926114 - A MODULAR BUILDING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Portakabin Limited New Ln. Huntington York YO32 9PT / GB | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pearce, Aidan York, YO32 9PT / GB | 02 /
Eastwood, Matthew York, YO32 9PT / GB | 03 /
Sawyer, Adam York, YO32 9PT / GB | 04 /
O'Sullivan, Sam York, YO32 9PT / GB | 05 /
Ward, Edward York, YO32 9PT / GB | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Sugden, Mark William Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 21179835.0 | 16.06.2021 | [2021/51] | Priority number, date | GB20200009355 | 18.06.2020 Original published format: GB 202009355 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3926114 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/348 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
E04B1/3483 (EP);
E04B1/348 (GB);
E04B1/19 (GB);
E04B1/2403 (GB);
E04B1/343 (GB);
E04D13/04 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2021/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE BAUEINHEIT | [2021/51] | English: | A MODULAR BUILDING UNIT | [2021/51] | French: | UNITÉ DE CONSTRUCTION MODULAIRE | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 21.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0465935 (JODAG MOBILSYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [XI]US2011036018 (HSU MU-CHI [TW], et al); | [XI]DE102014117529 (INNOVAC GES FÜR VAKUUMPHYSIK MBH [DE]); | [XI]US2019330838 (BOWRON JULIAN [CA]) |