EP3900940 - PRINTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Keisuke Nagoya-shi, 467-8562 / JP | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/42] |
Former [2021/43] | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 21180016.4 | 30.10.2019 | [2021/43] | Priority number, date | JP20180205898 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018205898 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3900940 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3900940 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/325, B41J2/355, B41J33/14, B41J35/08 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
B41J33/14 (EP);
B41J2/325 (EP,CN,US);
B41J2/355 (EP);
B41J35/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRUCKSYSTEM | [2021/43] | English: | PRINTING SYSTEM | [2021/43] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION | [2021/43] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 14.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19206286.7 / EP3647062 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | LU | 30.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
IT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
BE | 31.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2783460 (POLYPRINT [FR]) [A] 1 * page 17, line 17 - page 19, line 8 * * figures 2,4 *; | [XI]JP2001225537 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * figure - * [I] 2,3; | [A]US2014036019 (MORI FUTOSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0050] * * figure - *; | [A]US2014231894 (PAREKH KUNAL [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0053] ** figure - * | by applicant | JP2010036425 | JP2013049281 |