EP4106062 - CELL AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARTA Microbattery GmbH VARTA-Platz 1 73479 Ellwangen Jagst / DE | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elmer, Martin 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 02 /
Renschler, Philipp 73479 Ellwangen / DE | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21180182.4 | 17.06.2021 | [2022/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106062 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M10/42, H01M10/48 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H01M10/4257 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,KR);
G06K19/0702 (US);
G06K19/0723 (KR,US);
G06K19/07773 (US);
H01M10/0422 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0427 (US);
H01M10/0431 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (CN);
H01M10/058 (CN);
H01M2010/4278 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2220/20 (CN);
H01M2220/30 (CN);
H01M50/107 (KR);
H01M50/119 (KR);
H01M50/586 (KR);
H01M50/593 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/51] | English: | CELL AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAME | [2022/51] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014347249 (BOURILKOV JORDAN TODOROV [US], et al); | [X]DE102019208819 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |