EP4108285 - MICRONEEDLE ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Latch Medical Limited NovaUCD Belfield Innovation Park 4 Dublin / IE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTOLLO, Nicky Dublin, 24 / IE | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 21180577.5 | 21.06.2021 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108285 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
A61M37/0015 (EP);
A61M2037/0023 (EP);
A61M2037/0046 (EP);
A61M2037/0053 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKRONADELANORDNUNGEN | [2022/52] | English: | MICRONEEDLE ARRAYS | [2022/52] | French: | RÉSEAUX DE MICRO-AIGUILLES | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007127815 (ALZA CORP [US], et al); | [YD]WO2018069543 (UNIV COLLEGE DUBLIN NAT UNIV IRELAND DUBLIN [IE]); | [Y]CN112617749 (QIYI PLATFORM CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2018069543 | WO2019201903 | EP20200198798 |