EP3907570 - CLOUD CONTROLLED LASER FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glowforge Inc. 2944 First Avenue South Seattle, WA 98134 / US | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shapiro, Daniel Seattle, 98134 / US | 02 /
Gosselin, Mark Seattle, 98134 / US | 03 /
Wright, Anthony Seattle, 98134 / US | 04 /
Putney, Dean Seattle, 98134 / US | 05 /
Ellis, Timothy Seattle, 98134 / US | 06 /
Banka, Lauren Seattle, 98134 / US | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard, et al Thum & Partner Thum Mötsch Weickert Patentanwälte PartG mbB Siebertstr. 6 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Thum, Bernhard, et al Thum Mötsch Weickert Patentanwälte Siebertstr. 6 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21180624.5 | 12.02.2016 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | US201562115562P | 12.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562115562 P | US201562115571P | 12.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562115571 P | US201562222756P | 23.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562222756 P | US201562222758P | 23.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562222758 P | US201562222757P | 23.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562222757 P | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907570 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/406, G05B19/402, B23K26/08, B23K26/03, B23K37/02, B23K37/04, B23K26/38, B23K26/082 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
B23K26/032 (EP,US);
B23K26/00 (CN);
G06F21/121 (US);
B23K10/006 (US);
B23K26/08 (EP,US);
B23K26/082 (EP,US);
B23K26/0853 (EP,US);
B23K26/0876 (US);
B23K26/38 (EP,US);
B23K26/702 (CN);
B23K37/0211 (EP,US);
B23K37/0235 (EP,US);
B23K37/0408 (EP,US);
B23Q17/22 (US);
G05B19/18 (US);
G05B19/402 (EP,US);
G05B19/406 (EP,US);
B27M1/08 (EP);
B29C64/393 (EP);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31186 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32001 (US);
G05B2219/36053 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36199 (US);
G05B2219/37359 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37555 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42307 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45041 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45212 (US);
Y02P80/40 (EP,US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Title | German: | CLOUD-GESTEUERTE LASERHERSTELLUNG | [2021/45] | English: | CLOUD CONTROLLED LASER FABRICATION | [2021/45] | French: | FABRICATION AU LASER COMMANDÉE EN NUAGE | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16707596.9 / EP3256920 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1645925 (SOLIDWORKS CORP [US]); |