EP3904148 - WIRED AND WIRELESS CHARGING DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Power Co., Ltd. 792 Dongbu-daero Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18487 / KR | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Jung Goo 16517 Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21180860.5 | 11.08.2017 | [2021/44] | Priority number, date | KR20160103159 | 12.08.2016 Original published format: KR 20160103159 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904148 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/10, B60L53/12, B60L53/14 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
B60L53/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/12 (EP,US);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/305 (KR);
B60L53/53 (KR);
H02J50/12 (KR,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
B60Y2304/05 (KR);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERDRAHTETE UND DRAHTLOSE LADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTROFAHRZEUG | [2021/44] | English: | WIRED AND WIRELESS CHARGING DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2021/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGE FILAIRE ET SANS FIL POUR VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 03.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17839847.5 / EP3498522 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010224725 (PERLMAN STEPHEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 10 *; | [A]US2012153717 (OBAYASHI KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 6 *; | [X]EP2983267 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,4-7 *; | [A]EP2985875 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-7* figure 1 * |