EP4108341 - CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖGLUND, Kasper SE-144 63 RÖNNINGE / SE | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Group Patent P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Patent Department P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 21181024.7 | 23.06.2021 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108341 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B04B11/02, B04B7/00, B04B15/02, B04B1/08, F16J15/34 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B04B11/02 (EP,US);
B04B1/08 (EP,US);
B04B15/02 (EP,US);
B04B7/00 (EP);
F16J15/342 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALABSCHEIDER | [2022/52] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR | [2022/52] | French: | SÉPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 01.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4670002 (KOREEDA MASAKUNI [JP], et al); | [XY]US4810240 (ZUCCATO REMO [IT]); | [Y]WO2018117031 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]); | [YD]EP3384993 (ALFA LAVAL CORP AB [SE]) | by applicant | US2536793 | EP3384993 |