EP3922120 - GLOVE, COMPOSITION FOR DIP MOLDING, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING GLOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Midori Anzen Co., Ltd. 4-3, Hiroo 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENOMOTO, Norihide Tokyo, 150-8455 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA, Taichi Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | 03 /
SHIBATA, Kaname Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | 04 /
SHIBASAKI, Junji Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 21181056.9 | 20.11.2018 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | JP20170226274 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017226274 | JP20170253478 | 28.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017253478 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922120 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A41D19/00, A41D19/04, C08G59/42, C08L63/00, C08G59/32 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C08G59/32 (EP,CN,US);
A41D19/00 (RU,US);
C08K5/1515 (KR,US);
B29C41/14 (US);
A41D19/0055 (KR,US);
A41D19/0058 (EP,CN,US);
B29C41/003 (US);
C08F20/44 (US);
C08F236/12 (KR,US);
C08F279/02 (KR);
C08J5/02 (KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08K5/0025 (KR);
C08K5/11 (KR);
C08K5/12 (KR);
C08L33/20 (CN);
C08L63/00 (EP,CN);
C08L9/02 (KR);
A41D2500/54 (EP,US);
B29K2033/20 (US);
B29L2031/4864 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L33/20 (CN,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | HANDSCHUH, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM TAUCHFORMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HANDSCHUHS | [2021/50] | English: | GLOVE, COMPOSITION FOR DIP MOLDING, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING GLOVE | [2021/50] | French: | GANT, COMPOSITION POUR MOULAGE PAR IMMERSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN GANT | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18867324.8 / EP3516974 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2622976 (KOSSAN SDN BHD [MY], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-4 * * paragraph [0008] *; | [Y]WO2016013666 (MIDORI ANZEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-14 * * page 9, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]WO2017147638 (SEMPERIT AG HOLDING [AT]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-14 * * figure 2 * * page 9, line 5 - line 8 *; | [E]EP3575357 (MIDORI ANZEN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-15* claims 1-16 * | by applicant | JP5275520B | WO2017126660 | - NOBORU, EBIHARA et al., "Synthesis, and application to rubber latex", Reports of Chiba Industrial Technology Research Institute, (20101000), pages 22 - 27 |