EP3934244 - DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A MAPPING OF PROJECTOR PIXELS TO CAMERA PIXELS AND/OR OBJECT POSITIONS USING ALTERNATING PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Christie Digital Systems USA, Inc. 10550 Camden Drive Cypress, CA 90630 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARAGHER, Chad Kitchener, Ontario, N2H 4L5 / CA | 02 /
SPRUYT, Randy Waterloo, Ontario, N2V 1P4 / CA | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bamberger Straße 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 21181059.3 | 23.06.2021 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | US202016916818 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: US202016916818 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934244 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3934244 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
H04N9/3182 (EP);
H04N9/3191 (CN);
H04N9/3194 (EP,US);
H04N9/3179 (CN);
H04N9/3185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER ABBILDUNG VON PROJEKTORPIXELN AUF KAMERAPIXELN UND/ODER OBJEKTPOSITIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ALTERNIERENDEN MUSTERN | [2022/01] | English: | DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A MAPPING OF PROJECTOR PIXELS TO CAMERA PIXELS AND/OR OBJECT POSITIONS USING ALTERNATING PATTERNS | [2022/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE GÉNÉRER UN MAPPAGE DE PIXELS DE PROJECTEUR VERS DES PIXELS DE CAMÉRA ET/OU DES POSITIONS D'OBJET EN UTILISANT DES MOTIFS ALTERNATIFS | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 04.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014184914 (OSHIMA MITSUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0161] * * figure 5 *; | [A]US2019172423 (KUROKAWA MASUYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0096] ** figure 6 *; | [A]EP3637046 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0039] * * figure 3 * |