EP3961455 - DATA VERIFICATION METHODS, APPARATUSES, AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alipay (Hangzhou) Information Technology Co., Ltd. No. 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor, Section B Suite 801-11, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Renhui Hangzhou, Zhejiang, 310000 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Yuan Hangzhou, Zhejiang, 310000 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Xinmin Hangzhou, Zhejiang, 310000 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Wenyu Hangzhou, Zhejiang, 310000 / CN | 05 /
QIAN, Feng Hangzhou, Zhejiang, 310000 / CN | 06 /
GUO, Qianting Hangzhou, Zhejiang, 310000 / CN | 07 /
LI, Shubo Hangzhou, Zhejiang, 310000 / CN | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21181106.2 | 23.06.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | CN202010898940 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010898940 | [2022/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961455 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3961455 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04L9/00, H04L9/08, H04L9/32, G06F21/62, G06F21/64, G06Q40/00, G06Q20/40, G06Q30/06 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L67/1097 (CN);
H04L9/3242 (US);
G06F21/602 (CN);
G06F21/6245 (EP,CN);
G06F21/645 (EP);
G06Q20/4014 (EP);
G06Q20/4016 (EP);
G06Q30/06 (EP);
G06Q40/00 (EP);
G06Q40/04 (CN);
H04L63/0407 (CN);
H04L63/0428 (CN);
H04L63/102 (EP);
H04L63/12 (CN);
H04L63/126 (EP);
H04L9/008 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/0897 (EP);
H04L9/3218 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | G06F21/62, G06F21/64, H04L29/06, H04L9/00, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENPRÜFUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/09] | English: | DATA VERIFICATION METHODS, APPARATUSES, AND DEVICES | [2022/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS DE VÉRIFICATION DE DONNÉES | [2022/52] |
Former [2022/09] | PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS DE VERIFICATION DE DONNEES | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 31.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 23.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2017287068 (NUGENT TIM [GB]) [X] 13,15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0090] * [A] 1-12 [I] 14; | [A]EP3477891 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0075] ** paragraphs [0083] - [0089] *; | [XAI]CN110264190 (SHENZHEN ONECONNECT TECH CO LTD) [X] 13,15 * abstract * [A] 1-12 [I] 14; | [A]US2020204557 (SINGH KAPIL KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0094] * |