EP4050382 - CAMERA UNIT AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hui Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Zongbao Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Yan Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21181745.7 | 25.06.2021 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | CN202120433671U | 26.02.2021 Original published format: CN 202120433671 U | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050382 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4050382 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/14, G02B7/04, G02B13/00 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G02B7/08 (EP);
G03B17/12 (KR);
G02B3/14 (EP,US);
G02B13/001 (EP);
G02B26/004 (EP);
G02B3/12 (KR);
G02B7/021 (US);
G02B7/023 (US);
G02B7/10 (US);
G03B30/00 (EP,KR);
H04N23/55 (KR,US);
H04N23/57 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | KAMERAEINHEIT UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/35] | English: | CAMERA UNIT AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/35] | French: | UNITÉ DE CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101349795 (CREATIVE SENSOR INC [CN]) [Y] 12* figures 2, 3 *; | [X]US2019228562 (SONG SIN-JHONG [TW]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0926] - [0955]; figures 257-266 *; | [X]US2020124839 (ASCHWANDEN MANUEL [CH], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15 * figures 1,8 *; | [XY]WO2020173393 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * figures 5,8,9 * [Y] 12 | Examination | CN210927762U |