EP3952231 - VIRTUAL ROUTER TERMINATING AN OVERLAY TUNNEL IN A STORAGE AREA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koganti, Phanidhar 502032 Hyderabad / IN | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 21182410.7 | 19.03.2013 | [2022/06] | Priority number, date | US201261614392P | 22.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261614392 P | US201313801858 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313801858 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952231 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/713, H04L12/741, H04L12/931 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H04L45/74 (EP,US);
H04L12/18 (US);
H04L12/4633 (US);
H04L45/586 (EP,US);
H04L49/356 (EP,US);
H04L49/70 (EP,US);
H04L61/5007 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] |
Former [2022/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VIRTUELLER ROUTER ALS ABSCHLUSS EINES OVERLAY-TUNNELS IN EINEM SPEICHERBEREICHSNETZWERK | [2022/06] | English: | VIRTUAL ROUTER TERMINATING AN OVERLAY TUNNEL IN A STORAGE AREA NETWORK | [2022/06] | French: | ROUTEUR VIRTUEL TERMINANT UN TUNNEL SUPERPOSÉ DANS UN RÉSEAU DE STOCKAGE | [2022/06] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13715074.4 / EP2829031 | EP17169632.1 / EP3240250 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009037607 (FARINACCI DINO [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8,12-14 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0101] * * figures 2, 6a, 6B, 8 * [Y] 9 [I] 2,4,10,11,15; | [YA] - KNIGHT P ET AL, "LAYER 2 AND 3 VIRTUAL PRIVATE NETWORKS: TAXONOMY, TECHNOLOGY, AND STANDARDIZATION EFFORTS", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20040601), vol. 42, no. 6, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2004.1304248, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 124 - 131, XP001198207 [Y] 9 * page 124, section "Abstract" * * page 128, section "L3 VPN Architectures" * * page 130, section "Virtual Router L3 VPNs" * * figures 4, 5 * [A] 1-8,10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2004.1304248 | [A] - PAUL KNIGHT HAMID OULD-BRAHIM GREGORY WRIGHT NORTEL NETWORKS BRYAN GLEESON TAHOE NETWORKS TIMON SLOANE WEBSTACKS RICK BUBENIK SAVV, "Network based IP VPN Architecture using Virtual Routers; draft-ietf-ppvpn-vpn-vr-04.txt", 20030501, (20030501), vol. ppvpn, no. 4, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015025808 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - LOUATI W ET AL, "Network-based virtual personal overlay networks using programmable virtual routers", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20050801), vol. 43, no. 8, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2005.1497558, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 86 - 94, XP011137986 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2005.1497558 | by applicant | US2010246388 |