EP3936393 - INCLINABLE SUPPORT FOOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, RO | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simol S.P.A. Via Fiocchetti 14 42045 Luzzara (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGHETTI, Valter 46027 San Benedetto Po (MN) / IT | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42121 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21183066.6 | 01.07.2021 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | IT20200016843 | 10.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000016843 | [2022/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936393 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3936393 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60S9/12 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
B60S9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEIGBARER STÜTZFUSS | [2022/02] | English: | INCLINABLE SUPPORT FOOT | [2022/02] | French: | PIED DE SUPPORT INCLINABLE | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 28.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 16.08.2023 | |
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | GR | 17.11.2023 | |
IS | 16.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE965472 (PAUL GROEGER) [X] 1-3,7-10,13-16 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,11,12,17; | [X]DE3002735 (NORDIN BENGT ANDERS) [X] 1-4,9,10,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0945318 (FERRARI S P A FLLI [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,13* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0031]; figures 3-9; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE20104087U (GOLDSCHMITT TECHMOBIL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,13,15 * figure -; claim - * * page 11, line 32 - page 13, line 14 * |