EP4112901 - SEALING ELEMENT FOR HEAT EXCHANGERS IN A COOLING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Autosystemy SP. Z.O.O. Przemyslowa 3 32-050 Skawina / PL | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODZINA, Radoslaw 32 050 Skawina / PL | 02 /
NAWROCKI, Mateusz 32 050 Skawina / PL | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21183498.1 | 02.07.2021 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112901 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/18, F28F9/00, B60K11/04, F28F9/02, F28D1/04, F01P11/10 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
F01P3/18 (EP);
B60K11/04 (EP);
F01P11/10 (EP);
F28D1/0435 (EP);
F01P2003/187 (EP);
F01P2060/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSELEMENT FÜR WÄRMETAUSCHER IN EINEM KÜHLMODUL | [2023/01] | English: | SEALING ELEMENT FOR HEAT EXCHANGERS IN A COOLING MODULE | [2023/01] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR ÉCHANGEURS DE CHALEUR DANS UN MODULE DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 29.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]GB2373571 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,13-15 * pages 4-7 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 10,12 [Y] 5; | [A]US6470961 (CASE CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03074849 (MODULARE PLANUNGS UND KONSTRUK [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2011127005 (KEERL BJOERN [DE]) [A] 1-15* figure 3 *; | [YA]FR3070321 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [Y] 5 * figures 4-5 * * page 6 * [A] 1-4,6-15 |