EP4116574 - ROOT ASSEMBLY OF A WIND TURBINE BLADE FOR A WIND TURBINE, WIND TURBINE BLADE AND WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pernitsky, Cole Campbell 9000 Aalborg / DK | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2024/39] |
Former [2023/02] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21183733.1 | 05.07.2021 | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4116574 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4116574 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
F03D1/0658 (EP,US);
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F03D1/0691 (EP);
F05B2240/302 (EP);
F05B2260/30 (US);
F05B2260/301 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] |
Former [2023/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FUSSANORDNUNG EINER WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE, WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL UND WINDTURBINE | [2023/02] | English: | ROOT ASSEMBLY OF A WIND TURBINE BLADE FOR A WIND TURBINE, WIND TURBINE BLADE AND WIND TURBINE | [2023/02] | French: | ENSEMBLE BASE D'UNE PALE POUR ÉOLIENNE, PALE D'ÉOLIENNE ET ÉOLIENNE | [2023/02] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 11.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1238196 (AERPAC HOLDING B V [NL]); | [X]US2007253819 (DOORENSPLEET FLORIAN [DE], et al); | [XY]US2010124474 (JACOBSEN ERIC M [US], et al); | [X]US2012148404 (QUELL PETER [DE], et al); | [Y]US2014334934 (KANNENBERG JOHANNES [DE], et al); | [A]EP3839246 (SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY AS [DK]) |