EP3954434 - TUMOR BED IMPLANT FOR MULTIMODALITY TREATMENT OF AT RISK TISSUE SURROUNDING A RESECTION CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomas Jefferson University Innovation Pillar 901 Walnut Street Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | For all designated states Drexel University 3141 Chestnut Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUFFER, Paul Philadelphia, PA 19096 / US | 02 /
BAR-AD, Voichita Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US | 03 /
HURWITZ, Mark Narberth, PA 19071 / US | 04 /
LUGINBUHL, Adam Gulph Mills, PA 19428 / US | 05 /
MARCOLONGO, Michele Aston, PA 19014 / US | 06 /
RODRIGUES, Dario Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | 07 /
COGNETTI, David Penn Valley, PA 19072 / US | 08 /
CURRY, Joseph Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US | 09 /
PRUDNIKOVA, Katsiaryna Huntingdon Valley, PA 19006 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21183933.7 | 31.03.2017 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201662315839P | 31.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662315839 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3954434 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3954434 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, A61K41/00, A61K51/12, A61M25/10, A61N5/02, A61N2/00, // A61B5/00, A61B5/01, A61B5/06 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A61N5/1015 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/4848 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/6852 (EP,IL,US);
A61K41/0052 (EP,IL,US);
A61K51/1213 (EP,IL,US);
A61N2/002 (EP,IL,US);
A61N2/004 (EP,IL,US);
A61N5/025 (EP,IL,US);
A61N5/1027 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2025/1013 (EP,IL);
A61N2005/1024 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | TUMORBETTIMPLANTAT ZUR MULTIMODALEN BEHANDLUNG VON RISIKOGEWEBE UM EINE RESEKTIONSHÖHLE HERUM | [2022/07] | English: | TUMOR BED IMPLANT FOR MULTIMODALITY TREATMENT OF AT RISK TISSUE SURROUNDING A RESECTION CAVITY | [2022/07] | French: | IMPLANT DE LIT TUMORAL POUR TRAITEMENT MULTIMODALITÉ D'UN TISSU À RISQUE ENTOURANT UNE CAVITÉ DE RÉSECTION | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 18.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17776835.5 / EP3454737 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004242953 (GOOD ROGER [US]); | [XI]US2008146861 (MURPHY BRENT D [US], et al); | [XI]US2009054721 (MARTIN GREGORY T [US]) | by applicant | RU2322199 |