EP3936487 - COMPOSITION FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIAL MADE OF METAKAOLIN, ASSOCIATED MANUFACTURING METHOD AND USE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CONSTRUCTION ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoffmann Green Cement Technologies La Bretaudière - Chaillé-sous-les-Ormeaux 85310 Rives de l'Yon / FR | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, David 53410 Saint Ouen Des Toits / FR | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21184111.9 | 25.03.2016 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | FR20150052615 | 27.03.2015 Original published format: FR 1552615 | [2022/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936487 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/00, C04B28/26, C04B14/10, C04B38/02, C04B111/00, C04B111/60, C04B111/40 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
C04B28/26 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
C04B14/106 (EP,US);
C04B28/006 (EP,US);
C04B38/02 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00181 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00482 (US);
C04B2111/00594 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00637 (US);
C04B2111/40 (EP,US);
C04B2111/60 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B14/106, C04B20/04 (US,EP);
C04B28/006, C04B12/04, C04B14/106, C04B22/062 (US,EP);
C04B28/26, C04B7/02, C04B7/32, C04B7/323, C04B14/043, C04B14/10, C04B14/104, C04B14/106, C04B14/106, C04B14/18, C04B14/22, C04B14/30, C04B14/305, C04B18/08, C04B18/141, C04B18/165, C04B18/24, C04B18/245, C04B18/248, C04B18/26, C04B20/0048, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B22/126, C04B22/142, C04B2103/0088, C04B2103/32, C04B2103/46, C04B2103/54, C04B2103/58, C04B2103/65 (US,EP);
C04B38/02, C04B22/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR BAUSTOFFE AUF BASIS VON METAKAOLIN, ENTSPRECHENDES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BAUELEMENTEN | [2022/02] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIAL MADE OF METAKAOLIN, ASSOCIATED MANUFACTURING METHOD AND USE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CONSTRUCTION ELEMENTS | [2022/02] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR MATÉRIAU DE CONSTRUCTION A BASE DE MÉTAKAOLIN, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE ET UTILISATION POUR LA RÉALISATION D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 12.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16717425.9 / EP3274315 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0140135 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [I] 1-17,19-21 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 30; claims 1,6,21,23 *; | [IY]US2012192765 (HUYNH HIEU THAO [FR]) [I] 1-17,19-21 * paragraphs [0008] , [0019] , [0024] , [0049] , [0051] , [0055] , [0056] , [0073]; claims 1-15; table 1 * [Y] 18; | [Y] - T.W. CHENG ET AL, "Fire-resistant geopolymer produced by granulated blast furnace slag", MINERALS ENGINEERING., GB, (20030301), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0892-6875(03)00008-6, ISSN 0892-6875, pages 205 - 210, XP055243661 [Y] 18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0892-6875(03)00008-6 | by applicant | EP2061732 | FR2966823 | US2012192765 |