EP3936398 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT OF A HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Shinji Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
TAKEUCHI, Hiroaki Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
ISHIDA, Ryuta Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
ARAKAWA, Hiroaki Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
KINOMURA, Shigeki Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
HASHIMOTO, Keita Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
UOTANI, Akio Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 08 /
KAGAWA, Kazuyuki Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 09 /
KINOSHITA, Yusuke Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21184178.8 | 27.03.2017 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | JP20160069254 | 30.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016069254 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3936398 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3936398 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/00, B60W20/15, B60W40/09 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L50/10 (EP,US);
B60L50/15 (CN);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP,US);
B60W20/13 (US);
B60W20/15 (EP,US);
B60W40/09 (EP,US);
B60W40/12 (US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60L2260/52 (CN);
B60L2260/54 (CN);
B60W2050/0075 (EP,US);
B60W2510/242 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2530/18 (EP,US);
B60W2530/209 (US);
B60W2556/10 (EP,US);
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/84 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (EP);
Y10S903/903 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNGSEINHEIT EINES HYBRIDFAHRZEUGS | [2022/02] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT OF A HYBRID VEHICLE | [2022/02] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17162992.6 / EP3225485 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2191997 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2014081490 (ADELMAN KIM [US]); | [A]DE112013006509T (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE102015108989 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) | by applicant | JPH0819114 | EP3225485 | EP20170162992 |