EP4117135 - CONTROL OF ENERGY EXCHANGES BETWEEN A PLURALITY OF SYSTEMS CONNECTED TO A POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalysh, Ileskhan 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Schreck, Sebastian 90439 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21184318.0 | 07.07.2021 | [2023/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4117135 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/26 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H02J3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG VON ENERGIEAUSTAUSCHEN ZWISCHEN MEHREREN AN EINEM STROMNETZ ANGESCHLOSSENEN ANLAGEN | [2023/02] | English: | CONTROL OF ENERGY EXCHANGES BETWEEN A PLURALITY OF SYSTEMS CONNECTED TO A POWER SUPPLY | [2023/02] | French: | COMMANDE DES ÉCHANGES D'ÉNERGIE ENTRE PLUSIEURS SYSTÈMES RELIÉS À UN RÉSEAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/51] | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014031997 (MUKHERJEE MAHARAJ [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0024] - [0032]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102018222753 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0034] - [0036] * |