EP3940208 - AEROSOL SEPARATOR FOR THE SEPARATION OF AEROSOLS IN A BLOW-BY-GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | For all designated states Liebherr Machines Bulle SA Rue Hans-Liebherr 7 1630 Bulle / CH | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | ||
For all designated states Liebherr Machines Bulle SA Rue Hans-Liebherr, 7 1630 Bulle / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhi 1630 Bulle / CH | 02 /
PALMISANI, Domenico 10044 Panezza / IT | 03 /
REDFERN, Kyle D. Cedar Falls 50613 / US | [2024/37] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
Li, Zhi 1630 Bulle / CH | ||
02 /
Palmisani, Domenico 10044 Panezza / IT | |||
03 /
Redfern, Kyle D Cedar Falls, 50613 / US | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 21185106.8 | 12.07.2021 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | CH20200000878 | 15.07.2020 Original published format: CH 8782020 | [2022/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3940208 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3940208 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/04 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
F01M13/0405 (EP);
F01M13/04 (CH,US);
B01D45/06 (US);
B01D45/08 (CH);
F01M11/03 (US);
F02B67/00 (CH);
F02B77/04 (CH);
F01M2011/031 (US);
F01M2013/0461 (EP,CH,US);
F01M2013/0494 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | AEROSOLSEPARATOR ZUM ABSCHEIDEN VON AEROSOLEN IN EINEM BLOW-BY-GAS | [2022/03] | English: | AEROSOL SEPARATOR FOR THE SEPARATION OF AEROSOLS IN A BLOW-BY-GAS | [2022/03] | French: | SÉPARATEUR D'AÉROSOL PERMETTANT DE SÉPARER LES AÉROSOLS DANS UN GAZ DE FUITE | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 19.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5922911U ; | [A]JPS62116111U ; | [YA]DE102009018000 (ELRINGKLINGER AG [DE]); | [YA]DE102010027783 (HENGST GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]WO2019230310 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP]) |