EP3913891 - PROCESSING DATA ELEMENTS STORED IN BLOCKCHAIN NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Zhiyuan Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yanpeng Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 03 /
CHENG, Long Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21185355.1 | 15.05.2019 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913891 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F21/10, H04L9/32 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
H04L9/3265 (US);
G06F16/2379 (US);
G06F21/1015 (EP);
H04L63/0876 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (US);
H04L9/0637 (US);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON IN BLOCKCHAINNETZWERKEN GESPEICHERTEN DATENELEMENTEN | [2021/47] | English: | PROCESSING DATA ELEMENTS STORED IN BLOCKCHAIN NETWORKS | [2021/47] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'ÉLÉMENTS DE DONNÉES STOCKÉS DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE CHAÎNES DE BLOCS | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 17.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19741033.5 / EP3673640 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2016342978 (DAVIS STEVEN CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11,12 * paragraphs [0035] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0089] - [0112] * * figure 1 * [A] 9 [Y] 7,8,10 [I] 4; | [YA]US2018167200 (HIGH DONALD R [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0045] * * figure 6 *[A] 1-6,9,11,12; | [XAYI]WO2019032089 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,11,12 * paragraphs [0019] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0103] * [A] 9 [Y] 7,8,10 [I] 4 |