EP3939462 - ARTICLES OF FOOTWEAR COMPRISING A WOUND COMPONENT AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states adidas AG Adi-Dassler-Strasse 1 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corcoran-Tadd, Fionn Portland, OR 97217 / US | 02 /
Hennebery, Ian Portland, OR 97217 / US | 03 /
Padovani, Matteo Portland, OR 97217 / US | 04 /
Arnese, Carl Portland, OR 97217 / US | 05 /
W. Kleiman, Benjamin Portland, OR 97217 / US | 06 /
Nieto, Andrea Portland, OR 97217 / US | 07 /
Skye B, Berin Portland, OR 97217 / US | 08 /
M. Perrault, Jacques Portland, OR 97217 / US | 09 /
Razafindrakoto, Fano Portland, OR 97217 / US | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 21185370.0 | 13.07.2021 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | US202016927645 | 13.07.2020 Original published format: US202016927645 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3939462 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3939462 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A43B1/02, A43B23/02, A43B23/04, A43B1/04 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A43B1/02 (EP,CN);
A43B23/0245 (EP,CN,US);
A43B1/04 (EP);
A43B23/0205 (EP,CN);
A43B23/0235 (EP);
A43B23/0255 (EP);
A43B23/0265 (EP);
A43B23/04 (EP);
A43B23/07 (CN);
A43B5/06 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHWERK MIT EINER GEWICKELTEN KOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/03] | English: | ARTICLES OF FOOTWEAR COMPRISING A WOUND COMPONENT AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2022/03] | French: | ARTICLES DE CHAUSSURE COMPRENANT UN COMPOSANT ENROULÉ ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 30.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013219636 (DOJAN FREDERICK J [US], et al); | [X]US2014068968 (PODHAJNY DANIEL A [US], et al); | [X]US2015047225 (ZAVALA ROBERTO [US], et al); | [X]US2016058100 (DEALEY STUART W [US], et al); | [X]US2017035149 (BRUCE ROBERT M [US], et al); | [X]CN107072353 (NIKE INNOVATE CV); | [X]EP3549470 (ADIDAS AG [DE]) | by applicant | US2016180440 |