EP3943018 - SURGICAL STAPLING DEVICE WITH TISSUE GAP CONTROL AND CONTROLLED STAPLE FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEARDSLEY, John W. Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
MARCZYK, Stanislaw Z. Stratford, Connecticut 06614 / US | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 21186438.4 | 19.07.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | US202016933461 | 20.07.2020 Original published format: US202016933461 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943018 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN);
A61B17/0686 (US);
A61B17/072 (US);
A61B2017/07221 (US);
A61B2017/07228 (CN);
A61B2017/07242 (EP);
A61B2017/0725 (US);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07264 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE KLAMMERVORRICHTUNG MIT GEWEBELÜCKENSTEUERUNG UND GESTEUERTER KLAMMERBILDUNG | [2022/04] | English: | SURGICAL STAPLING DEVICE WITH TISSUE GAP CONTROL AND CONTROLLED STAPLE FORMATION | [2022/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AGRAFAGE CHIRURGICAL AVEC CONTRÔLE DE L'ÉCARTEMENT DES TISSUS ET FORMATION CONTRÔLÉE DES AGRAFES | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 22.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2023 | Observations by third parties | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP0541950 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | [A]US8418904 (WENCHELL THOMAS [US], et al); | [XA]JP2013215572 (COVIDIEN LP); | [XA]US2018008260 (BAXTER III CHESTER O [US], et al); | [XA]US10092292 (BOUDREAUX CHAD P [US], et al); | [XA]US2019099182 (BAKOS GREGORY J [US], et al); | [XA]US2020121317 (KOSTRZEWSKI STANISLAW [US]) | by applicant | US6241139 | other | CA1284551 | EP0541950 | US5586711 |