EP4123390 - MULTI-COLOURED ITEM MADE FROM CERMET AND/OR CERAMIC AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 28.07.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | 28.07.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comadur S.A. Col-des-Roches 33 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT OBERSON, Maryline 25130 Villers-le-Lac / FR | 02 /
ACTIS-DATTA, Arnaud 2854 Bassecourt / CH | 03 /
NETUSCHILL, Alexandre 2414 Le Cerneux-Péquignot / CH | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21186468.1 | 19.07.2021 | [2023/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123390 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G04B5/16, B28B1/00, B28B1/24, C04B33/14, C04B35/645, G04B19/04, G04B19/12, G04B19/28, G04B29/02, G04B37/22, G04B47/00, G04D3/00 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G04B19/12 (EP,KR,US);
G04B37/225 (EP,KR,US);
G04B45/0076 (US);
B22F3/12 (KR);
B23K26/0622 (KR);
B23K26/36 (KR);
B28B1/008 (EP,KR,US);
B28B11/005 (KR);
B28B11/089 (US);
B28B11/12 (EP);
B28B11/24 (US);
B28B17/0009 (KR);
B28B23/0075 (US);
B28B3/02 (KR);
B28B3/10 (EP);
B32B18/00 (EP);
B44C1/26 (US);
C04B35/486 (EP);
G04B19/042 (EP);
G04B19/28 (EP);
G04B29/027 (EP);
G04B3/04 (KR);
G04B47/00 (EP);
G04B5/16 (EP);
G04D3/00 (EP);
G04D3/0046 (EP);
G04D3/0048 (EP);
G04D3/0053 (EP);
C04B2235/612 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFARBIGER ARTIKEL AUS ZERMET UND/ODER KERAMIK UND SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/04] | English: | MULTI-COLOURED ITEM MADE FROM CERMET AND/OR CERAMIC AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2023/04] | French: | ARTICLE MULTICOLORE EN CERMET ET/OU CÉRAMIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 25.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CH708654 (RADO MONTRES SA [CH]) [X] 5-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0025] , [0046]; figures 1-5 * [I] 1-4,10; | [A]CN108439997 (DONGGUAN CSG CERAMICS TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]CN110666931 (DONGGUAN CSG CERAMICS TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3622846 (COMADUR SA [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0007]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | EP2746243 |