EP3960947 - ANCHOR BAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG Klaus-Fischer-Strasse 1 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wittmann, Falk 04564 Böhlen / DE | 02 /
Unterweger, Roland 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | 03 /
Wiedner, Christoph 6800 Feldkirch / AT | 04 /
Blum, Emil 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Suchy, Ulrich Johannes fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG Gewerbliche Schutzrechte Klaus-Fischer-Strasse 1 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 21187076.1 | 22.07.2021 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | DE202010122305 | 26.08.2020 Original published format: DE102020122305 | [2022/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960947 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/41 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
E04B1/4107 (EP);
E04G21/30 (CN);
E04B1/41 (CN);
E04G17/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANKERSCHIENE | [2022/09] | English: | ANCHOR BAR | [2022/09] | French: | RAIL D'ANCRAGE | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 03.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2317339 ; | [XAY]US5357721 (ALVAREZ GUSTAVO O [US]); | [X]US2014250825 (RICHARDSON DOUGLAS S [US]) | by applicant | GB2243396 |