EP4123061 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GALLIUM OXIDE LAYER ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siltronic AG Einsteinstraße 172 Tower B / Blue Tower 81677 München / DE | For all designated states Leibniz-Institut für Kristallzüchtung im Forschungsverbund Berlin e.V. Max-Born-Str. 2 12489 Berlin / DE | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/04] | For all designated states Siltronic AG Einsteinstraße 172 Tower B / Blue Tower 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chou, Ta-Shun 13587 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Häckl, Walter 84558 Kirchweidach / DE | 03 /
Popp, Andreas 15732 Eichwalde / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21187231.2 | 22.07.2021 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123061 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/16, C30B29/16, C23C16/40, C23C16/455, C23C16/52 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C30B29/16 (EP,KR,US);
C30B25/16 (EP,KR);
C30B25/165 (US);
C23C16/40 (EP,KR);
C23C16/45523 (EP,KR);
C23C16/52 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GALLIUMOXIDSCHICHT AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2023/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GALLIUM OXIDE LAYER ON A SUBSTRATE | [2023/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COUCHE D'OXYDE DE GALLIUM SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 21.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 21.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 21.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 21.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1854904 (OPTICAL REFERENCE SYSTEMS LTD [GB]); | [Y]US2020292299 (IYECHIKA YASUSHI [JP]); | by applicant | US6289842 | EP3242965 |