EP4000987 - POWER FEEDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Masakazu Tokyo, 141-8562 / JP | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 21187422.7 | 23.07.2021 | [2022/21] | Priority number, date | JP20200194474 | 24.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020194474 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000987 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/12, B60L53/30, B60L53/36, H02J7/00, H02J50/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
B60L53/12 (EP,US);
B62B5/00 (CN);
B60L53/35 (US);
B60L53/30 (EP);
B60L53/36 (EP);
H02J50/005 (EP);
H02J50/10 (CN);
H02J50/12 (US);
H02J50/40 (US);
H02J50/90 (US);
H02J7/0042 (EP);
H02J7/0044 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG | [2022/21] | English: | POWER FEEDING DEVICE | [2022/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 18.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7741808 (FOWLER DOUG [US], et al); | [Y]EP3650310 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]); | [XY]EP3713042 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]); | [Y]EP3713043 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) |