EP3919760 - JOINT FOR THE FIRM INTERCONNECTION OF A FIRST AND A SECOND PANEL OF FURNITURE AND OTHER FURNISHING ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEONARDO S.r.l. Via Leopardi 8 22060 Figino Serenza (CO) / IT | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATTANEO, Carlo 22060 Figino Serenza (CO) / IT | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Dragotti & Associati S.R.L. Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [2024/29] |
Former [2021/49] | Franco Martegani S.r.l. Via Carlo Alberto, 41 20900 Monza / IT | Application number, filing date | 21187700.6 | 10.03.2017 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | IT20160070959 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: IT201600070959 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919760 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3919760 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/20, F16B12/46, F16B35/00, F16B5/06, F16B5/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
F16B12/2063 (EP,RU,US);
F16B5/0024 (EP,RU,US);
F16B12/14 (RU,US);
F16B12/46 (EP,RU);
F16B35/005 (EP,RU,US);
F16B2005/0678 (EP);
F16B2012/145 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG ZUM FESTEN VERBINDEN EINER ERSTEN UND EINER ZWEITEN PLATTE VON MÖBELN UND ANDEREN EINRICHTUNGSGEGENSTÄNDEN | [2021/49] | English: | JOINT FOR THE FIRM INTERCONNECTION OF A FIRST AND A SECOND PANEL OF FURNITURE AND OTHER FURNISHING ITEMS | [2021/49] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DESTINÉ AU RACCORD SOLIDE D'UN PREMIER ET D'UN SECOND PANNEAU DE MOBILIER ET D'AUTRES ARTICLES D'AMEUBLEMENT | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 07.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17160395.4 / EP3267049 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1331299 ; | [A]FR2333991 (AUBIER CUNY SA [FR]); | [A]DE2624273 (WARTH FA ERWIN); | [A]US4634309 (DEWEY DAVE [GB]); | [A]SE1300329 (FURNPARTS AB [SE]); | [E]WO2017153175 (LEONARDO SRL [IT]) | by applicant | EP0930436 |