EP4124662 - PD-L1 MIRNAS FOR DISEASE PROGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.08.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | 04.08.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martin-Luther-Universität Halle-Wittenberg Universitätsplatz 10 06108 Halle (Saale) / DE | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seliger, Barbara 06114 Halle / DE | 02 /
Vaxevanis, Christoforos 06108 Halle / DE | 03 /
Friedrich, Michael 35037 Marburg / DE | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/05] | Application number, filing date | 21187791.5 | 26.07.2021 | [2023/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124662 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/112 (EP);
C12Q2600/118 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP);
C12Q2600/178 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] |
Former [2023/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PD-L1-MIRNAS ZUR KRANKHEITSPROGNOSE | [2023/05] | English: | PD-L1 MIRNAS FOR DISEASE PROGNOSIS | [2023/05] | French: | MIARN PD-L1 POUR LE PRONOSTIC DE MALADIES | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 01.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2016064989 (NAT CANCER CT) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2020016900 (EXOSTEM BIOTEC LTD [IL]) [X] 12 * the whole document * [I] 1-4,6,7,14,15; | [A] - LI DONG ET AL, "Programmed Death Ligand-1 (PD-L1) Regulated by NRF-2/MicroRNA-1 Regulatory Axis Enhances Drug Resistance and Promotes Tumorigenic Properties in Sorafenib-Resistant Hepatoma Cells", ONCOLOGY RESEARCH., US, (20201210), vol. 28, no. 5, doi:10.3727/096504020X15925659763817, ISSN 0965-0407, pages 467 - 481, XP055872081 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3727/096504020X15925659763817 | [XI] - HUANG JIANSHENG ET AL, "MicroRNA-155-5p suppresses PD-L1 expression in lung adenocarcinoma", FEBS OPEN BIO, US, vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1002/2211-5463.12853, ISSN 2211-5463, (20200422), pages 1065 - 1071, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.1002/2211-5463.12853, XP055872388 [X] 12 * the whole document * [I] 1-4,6,7,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/2211-5463.12853 | [A] - YOON CHAN JIN ET AL, "Epstein-Barr virus-encoded miR-BART5-5p upregulates PD-L1 through PIAS3/pSTAT3 modulation, worsening clinical outcomes of PD-L1-positive gastric carcinomas", GASTRIC CANCER, SPRINGER SINGAPORE, SINGAPORE, vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S10120-020-01059-3, ISSN 1436-3291, (20200323), pages 780 - 795, (20200323), XP037222734 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10120-020-01059-3 | [XI] - YANG QIN ET AL, "Regulation of cancer immune escape: The roles of miRNAs in immune checkpoint proteins", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20180522), vol. 431, doi:10.1016/J.CANLET.2018.05.015, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 73 - 84, XP085413275 [X] 12 * the whole document * [I] 1-4,6,7,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.canlet.2018.05.015 | [XI] - YEE DANIEL ET AL, "MicroRNA-155 induction via TNF-[alpha] and IFN-[gamma] suppresses expression of programmed death ligand-1 (PD-L1) in human primary cells", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20171201), vol. 292, no. 50, doi:10.1074/jbc.M117.809053, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 20683 - 20693, XP055872404 [X] 12 * the whole document * [I] 1-4,6,7,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M117.809053 | [XI] - HAN JIAQIAN ET AL, "Recent advances of molecular mechanisms of regulating PD-L1 expression in melanoma", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 88, doi:10.1016/J.INTIMP.2020.106971, ISSN 1567-5769, (20200918), (20200918), XP086319667 [X] 12 * the whole document * [I] 1-4,6,7,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.intimp.2020.106971 | by applicant | - KIM, J.M.D.S. CHEN, Ann Oncol, (20160000), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 1492 - 504 | - FRIEDRICH, M. et al., Journal for immunotherapy of cancer, (20200000), vol. 8, no. 1 | - BRAUN, J et al., Nucleic acids research, (20140000), vol. 42, no. 8, pages e66 - e66 | - BRAUN, J. et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20140000), vol. 42, no. 8, page e66 | - TRETBAR, U.S. et al., Methods Mol Biol, (20190000), vol. 1913, pages 81 - 101 |