EP4124755 - A MEMBRANE-BASED PISTON PUMP AND A HOMOGENISING APPARATUS COMPRISING THE MEMBRANE-BASED PISTON PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Mechanical Equipment Italia S.p.A. Via A. M. da Erba Edoari 29 43123 Parma / IT | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONTANESI, Filippo 43123 PARMA / IT | 02 /
FOLEZZANI, Matteo 43123 PARMA / IT | 03 /
BENASSI, Massimiliano 43045 FORNOVO DI TARO (PR) / IT | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Dondi, Silvia Bugnion S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [2023/05] | Application number, filing date | 21187816.0 | 26.07.2021 | [2023/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124755 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4124755 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/067, F04B43/073, F04B49/08, F04B49/22 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
F04B43/067 (EP,KR,US);
F04B49/22 (EP,KR,US);
F04B43/073 (EP,KR,US);
F04B49/002 (US);
F04B49/08 (EP,KR,US);
F04B53/12 (US);
F04B53/16 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] | Title | German: | MEMBRANBASIERTE KOLBENPUMPE UND HOMOGENISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT DER MEMBRANBASIERTEN KOLBENPUMPE | [2023/05] | English: | A MEMBRANE-BASED PISTON PUMP AND A HOMOGENISING APPARATUS COMPRISING THE MEMBRANE-BASED PISTON PUMP | [2023/05] | French: | POMPE À PISTON À MEMBRANE ET APPAREIL D'HOMOGÉNÉISATION COMPRENANT LA POMPE À PISTON À MEMBRANE | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 15.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | LU | 26.07.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/18] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5246351 (HORN WALDEMAR [DE], et al); | [YA]US5624246 (KUHLENSCHMIDT DONALD [US]); | [Y]US6554578 (SIEGEL NORBERT [DE]); | [YDA]US2012011998 (JOHANSSON CLAES-GOERAN [SE], et al); | [A]DE102014010108 (LEWA GMBH [DE]); | [YA]WO2020250042 (GEA MECH EQUIPMENT ITALIA S P A [IT]) | by applicant | US2012011998 |