EP3989466 - TRANSMISSION OF UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION IN WIRELESS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Hong Cupertino, 95014 / US | 02 /
HAN, Seunghee Cupertino, 95014 / US | 03 /
DAVYDOV, Alexei Vladimirovich Cupertino, 95014 / US | 04 /
XIONG, Gang Cupertino, 95014 / US | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Wardle, Callum Tarn Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 21187869.9 | 23.12.2015 | [2022/17] | Priority number, date | US201562219950P | 17.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562219950 P | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989466 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3989466 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/1607 (US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,US);
H04W52/325 (US);
H04W72/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON UPLINK-STEUERUNGSINFORMATIONEN IN DRAHTLOSEN SYSTEMEN | [2022/17] | English: | TRANSMISSION OF UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION IN WIRELESS SYSTEMS | [2022/17] | French: | TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS DES SYSTÈMES SANS FIL | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15904216.7 / EP3350951 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013258960 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract ** page 6, paragraph 64 - page 9, paragraph 102 *; | [X]US2014078942 (NOH MIN SEOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph 6 * |