EP3945015 - MARITIME DRONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovo Engineering and Construction LTD 37 Albyn Place Aberdeen AB10 1JB / GB | [2022/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIBERIO, Andrea 35020 Albignasego (PD) / IT | 02 /
MALAGODI, Stefano 25019 Sirmione (BS) / IT | [2022/05] | Representative(s) | Caldon, Giuliano, et al Gallo & Partners S.r.l. Via Rezzonico, 6 35131 Padova / IT | [2022/05] | Application number, filing date | 21188014.1 | 27.07.2021 | [2022/05] | Priority number, date | IT20200018499 | 29.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000018499 | [2022/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945015 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3945015 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63H9/061, B63B15/00 | [2022/05] | CPC: |
B63H9/0635 (EP,US);
B63B15/0083 (EP,US);
B63B27/16 (EP);
B63B2003/382 (EP);
B63B2003/387 (EP);
B63B2015/0041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEERESDROHNE | [2022/05] | English: | MARITIME DRONE | [2022/05] | French: | DRONE MARIN | [2022/05] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 22.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2018162502 (MCCLURE VANCE E [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2019233056 (DANE ROBERT [AU], et al) [AD] 1-10* the whole document * | by applicant | US10399651 | US10526048 |