EP4124529 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A FAILURE IN A VEHICLE PNEUMATIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Chidambaram 27407 NC, Greensboro / US | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/34] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2023/05] | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 21188514.0 | 29.07.2021 | [2023/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124529 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4124529 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/22 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
B60T17/221 (EP);
B60T8/885 (US);
B60T17/22 (US);
G01M3/26 (US);
B60T13/662 (EP);
B60T2270/40 (EP);
B60T2270/406 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2023/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES FEHLERS IN EINEM PNEUMATISCHEN FAHRZEUGSYSTEM | [2023/05] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING A FAILURE IN A VEHICLE PNEUMATIC SYSTEM | [2023/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE DÉFAILLANCE DANS UN SYSTÈME PNEUMATIQUE DE VÉHICULE | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 24.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108715163 (LYU SHAN, et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]CN110633792 (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020010061 (TIWARI KARTIK [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0060]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2020139952 (VAN THIEL JULIAN [DE]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0049] - [0055]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CN111272412 (BEIJING HOPEN INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |