EP3967128 - FORAGE HARVESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heitmann, Christoph 48231 Warendorf / DE | 02 /
Belau, Sven Carsten 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 03 /
Bönig, Ingo 33330 Gütersloh / DE | 04 /
Meyer zu Hörste, Jan 49214 Bad Rothenfelde / DE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21189038.9 | 02.08.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | DE202010123526 | 09.09.2020 Original published format: DE102020123526 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967128 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01D43/10, // A01D43/08 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A01D43/102 (EP);
A01D43/085 (EP,US);
A01D82/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FELDHÄCKSLER | [2022/11] | English: | FORAGE HARVESTER | [2022/11] | French: | RAMASSEUSE-HACHEUSE | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 16.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP3530102 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHRENDE ERNTEMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,15 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0 29] - [0032] - [0 41] * [Y] 9,10; | [IY]DE102018104289 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHRENDE ERNTEMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,15 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 24] , [0 32] , [0 34] - [0036] * [Y] 9,10; | [I]DE102018104287 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHRENDE ERNTEMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,15 * figures 1-6 ** paragraphs [0045] , [0 48] , [0 76] *; | [XY]EP3646703 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1-8,11-14 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0 20] , [0 23] , [0 24] , [0 28] , [0 29] , [0 32] - [0035] * [Y] 9,10 | by applicant | EP2361495 |