EP4130694 - A TEMPERATURE SENSOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB SCHWEIZ AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEBHARDT, Joerg 55130 Mainz / DE | 02 /
ACKERMANN, Patric 64405 Fischbachtal / DE | 03 /
DASGUPTA, Subhashish 560066 Bangalore / IN | 04 /
DAAKE, Wilhelm 32469 Petershagen / DE | 05 /
SCHROEDER, Karsten 32469 Petershagen / DE | 06 /
SOSALE, Guruprasad 80997 München / DE | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21189173.4 | 02.08.2021 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130694 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/02, G01K1/143, G01K1/16, G01K7/42, G01K13/02, G01K3/14 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G01K1/143 (EP,US);
G01K1/026 (EP);
G01K1/08 (US);
G01K1/16 (EP);
G01K13/02 (EP);
G01K3/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] |
Former [2023/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSENSORANORDNUNG | [2023/06] | English: | A TEMPERATURE SENSOR ASSEMBLY | [2023/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 01.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015099933 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [X] 1,9,11-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] - [0009] - [0011] , [0012] , [0015] , [0021]; figures 1,2,4 *[I] 2-8,10 | by applicant | WO2019063519 |