EP3923237 - DETECTION OF PROSTATE CANCER IN MULTI-PARAMETRIC MRI USING RANDOM FOREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States of America as represented by The Secretary Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20852-7660 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAY, Nathan, S. Bethesda, 20892 / US | 02 /
TSEHAY, Yohannes Bethesda, 20892 / US | 03 /
SUMMERS, Ronald, M Bethesda, 20892 / US | 04 /
TURKBEY, Baris Bethesda, 20892 / US | 05 /
GREER, Matthew Bethesda, 20892 / US | 06 /
CHENG, Ruida Bethesda, 20892 / US | 07 /
ROTH, Holger Bethesda, 20892 / US | 08 /
MCAULIFFE, Matthew, J Bethesda, 20892 / US | 09 /
GAUR, Sonia Bethesda, 20852 / US | 10 /
MERTAN, Francesca Bethesda, 20892 / US | 11 /
CHOYKE, Peter Bethesda, 20892 / US | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 21189335.9 | 22.02.2018 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | US201762462256P | 22.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762462256 P | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923237 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
G06T2207/10088 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20084 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30096 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2021/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DETEKTION VON PROSTATAKREBS IN MULTIPARAMETRISCHER MRT UNTER VERWENDUNG VON RANDOM-FOREST | [2021/50] | English: | DETECTION OF PROSTATE CANCER IN MULTI-PARAMETRIC MRI USING RANDOM FOREST | [2021/50] | French: | DÉTECTION DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE DANS UNE IRM MULTI-PARAMÉTRIQUE À L'AIDE D'UNE FORÊT ALÉATOIRE | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 15.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18710950.9 / EP3586305 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI] - LITJENS GEERT ET AL, "Computer-Aided Detection of Prostate Cancer in MRI", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 33, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TMI.2014.2303821, ISSN 0278-0062, (20140501), pages 1083 - 1092, (20140422), XP011546108 [X] 1,4,6,8,9 * abstract * * Section A. MRI Data; page 1084 * * Section D. Voxel Features; page 1085, column left - page 1086, column left; table 1 * * Section E. Voxel Classification; page 1086, column right * * Section J. Validation; page 1087, column right - page 1088, column left * [A] 7 [Y] 5 [I] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2014.2303821 | [XYI] - QIAN CHUNJUN ET AL, "In vivo MRI based prostate cancer localization with random forests and auto-context model", COMPUTERIZED MEDICAL IMAGING AND GRAPHICS, PERGAMON PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20160227), vol. 52, doi:10.1016/J.COMPMEDIMAG.2016.02.001, ISSN 0895-6111, pages 44 - 57, XP029627218 [X] 1,6-9 * abstract * * last full paragraph; page 45, column right * * Section 2.2. Prostate cancer localization with random forests and auto-context model; page 46, column right - page 47, column left * * Section 2.3. Random forests; page 47, column left * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 5 [I] 2-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compmedimag.2016.02.001 | [YA] - ANDRIK RAMPUN ET AL, "Computer-aided detection of prostate cancer in T2-weighted MRI within the peripheral zone", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, vol. 61, no. 13, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/61/13/4796, ISSN 0031-9155, (20160608), pages 4796 - 4825, (20160608), XP020306400 [Y] 5 * abstract * * Section 2.3.2. Second order statistical features (F2); page 4800; figure 3; table 1 * * Section 2.3.1. First order statistical features (F1); page 4800 * [A] 1-4,6-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/61/13/4796 | [A] - KWAK JIN TAE ET AL, "Automated prostate cancer detection usingT2-weighted and high-b-value diffusion-weighted magnetic resonance imaging", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 42, no. 5, doi:10.1118/1.4918318, ISSN 0094-2405, (20150501), pages 2368 - 2378, (19010101), XP012196648 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.4918318 |