EP4129597 - SUGAR-CONTAINING BINDER SYSTEM FOR WOOD MATERIAL BOARDS, A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A WOOD MATERIAL BOARD USING THIS SUGAR-CONTAINING BINDER SYSTEM AND WOOD MATERIAL BOARD OBTAINED BY THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWISS KRONO Tec AG Museggstrasse 14 6004 Luzern / CH | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalwa, Norbert 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | 02 /
Seidack, Georg 16835 Herzberg (Mark) / DE | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21189858.0 | 05.08.2021 | [2023/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4129597 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4129597 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B27N1/00, B27N1/02, B27N3/02, C08L97/02, C09J175/04, C08G18/30, C08G18/32, C08G18/76, // B27N3/04 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B27N3/002 (EP);
B27N1/003 (EP);
B27N1/0209 (EP);
B27N3/02 (EP);
C08G18/302 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/7621 (EP);
C08G18/7664 (EP);
C08G18/7671 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | B27N1/00, B27N1/02, B27N3/02, C08L97/02, C09J175/04, // B27N3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ZUCKERHALTIGES BINDEMITTELSYSTEM FÜR HOLZWERKSTOFFPLATTEN, EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HOLZWERKSTOFFPLATTE UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESES ZUCKERHALTIGEN BINDEMITTELSYSTEMS UND HOLZWERKSTOFFPLATTE HERGESTELLT NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN | [2023/06] | English: | SUGAR-CONTAINING BINDER SYSTEM FOR WOOD MATERIAL BOARDS, A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A WOOD MATERIAL BOARD USING THIS SUGAR-CONTAINING BINDER SYSTEM AND WOOD MATERIAL BOARD OBTAINED BY THIS METHOD | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LIANT CONTENANT DU SUCRE POUR PANNEAUX EN MATÉRIAU DÉRIVÉ DU BOIS, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU EN MATÉRIAU DÉRIVÉ DU BOIS À L'AIDE DUDIT SYSTÈME DE LIANT CONTENANT DU SUCRE ET PANNEAU EN MATÉRIAU DÉRIVÉ DU BOIS FABRIQUÉ SELON LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 17.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 22.11.2023 | |
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 22.11.2023 | |
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19756154 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [XY]US2003134945 (CAPPS CHARLES L [US]); | [XY]DE102011002809 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]); | [XYI]US2017361580 (WEINKÖTZ STEPHAN [DE], et al); | [XY]CN109609080 (SHANDONG TONGCHUANG FINE CHEMICALS CO LTD) | by applicant | US6822042 |